HOLY ROOD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to contemplative orders for the purposes of relieving poverty and advancing education in accordance with the charity's objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 December 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister Mary Philomena Donnelly | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
Abbot THOMAS QUIN OSB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
GERALD EDWARD KIDD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
SISTER Colette Anne Jordan | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.66k | £23.91k | £35.61k | £26.61k | £28.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.46k | £32.71k | £42.25k | £62.51k | £64.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 NOVEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 2 JULY 2007 SCHEME AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06/12/2012 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2014 AS AMENDED ON 14 AUG 2023 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 14 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
A. RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG MONKS AND NUNS THE MEMBERS OF WHICH DEVOTE THEIR LIVES TO PRAYER AND CONTEMPLATION. B. PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF MONKS AND NUNS IN SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO EFFICIENT ADMINISTRATION OF THE AFFAIRS OF THE COMMUNITIES TO WHICH THEY BELONG. C. RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF OLD AGE, ILLNESS OR DISABILITY AMONG MONKS AND NUNS WITHIN THE UK, THE MEMBERS OF WHICH DEVOTE THEIR LIVES TO PRAYER AND CONTEMPLATION.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
PWW Solicitors
84 Eccleston Square
LONDON
SW1V 1PX
- Phone:
- 02078020140
- Email:
- ctyson@pwwsolicitors.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window