PETER SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 269065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Interests lie in medical sciences, jewish concerns, heritage and forestry/land restoration and the quality of life in local areas (South Central Berkshire, East Somerset and The Highlands of Scotland).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £155,097
Total expenditure: £158,107

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 March 1975: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VISCOUNT NICHOLAS ALAN BEARSTED Chair
THE PETER SAMUEL ROYAL FREE FUND
Received: On time
THE HON MICHAEL JOHN SAMUEL Trustee
THE PETER SAMUEL ROYAL FREE FUND
Received: On time
COL WILFRED HORATIO MICHOLLS DECEASED CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE M J SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HON A G SAMUEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
FULL FACT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £132.46k £87.92k £218.14k £140.72k £155.10k
Total expenditure £231.65k £69.70k £217.20k £156.45k £158.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 16 February 2024 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 February 2024 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FARLEY HALL
CASTLE ROAD
FARLEY HILL
READING
RG7 1UL
Phone:
01189730047
Website:

No information available