BRENT DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training Amateur Sport Economic/Community Development/Employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brent
Governance
- 03 June 1976: Standard registration
- WILLESDEN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Working name)
- WILLESDEN BOY SCOUT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- WILLESDEN DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN BEARD | Chair |
|
||||||
Jack Stride | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHAILA SHAH | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Green | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francis William Penter | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David William Kitchen | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Delisle Easmond | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DENISE HELEN JULIA PAMBAKIAN | Trustee | 21 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR TOOMBS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.14k | £65.93k | £111.87k | £58.60k | £85.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.34k | £72.93k | £134.15k | £126.74k | £162.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.97k | £21.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brent District Scouts
Village Way
LONDON
NW10 0LH
- Phone:
- 02039301699
- Email:
- info@brentscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window