FARRINGDON SCHOOL PLAYGROUND

Charity number: 272320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

to help children

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £590
Total expenditure: £385

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FARINGDON SCHOOL PLAYGROUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeremy John Cowan Chair 27 October 2017
None on record
Nadine Barbara Farris Trustee 27 October 2017
None on record
Councillor Mark Norman Kemp-Gee Trustee 13 May 2013
THE EGGAR'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL, ALTON, SITE FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £521 £521 £521 £521 £590
Total expenditure £600 £550 £300 £500 £385
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 June 2024 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CROFT
THE STREET
UPPER FARRINGDON
ALTON
GU34 3DT
Phone:
01420588200
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available