SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF WESTMINSTER CATHEDRAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the Society is to support the activities of Westminster Cathedral. Funds are raised to further this object from membership subscriptions, donations and by means of events approved and monitored by the trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 10 February 1977: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF WESTMINSTER CATHEDRAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benedict Alexander Jennings | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Monica Nkechi Mbanefo | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Sandra Anne McNally | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Margaret Gibson | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Marmont Johnson | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
BRIAN ANDREW HOLLINGSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.40k | £86.81k | £110.71k | £270.20k | £94.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.26k | £75.92k | £141.81k | £67.04k | £37.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2024 | 267 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 1977 AS AMENDED 4 OCTOBER 1978 AS AMENDED 25TH APRIL 2002 AND 25 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND EMBELLISHMENT OF WESTMINSTER CATHEDRAL AND ITS PRECINCTS INCLUDING THE CLERGY HOUSE (ALL HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS 'THE CATHEDRAL') AND THE SUPPORT OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH WESTMINSTER CATHEDRAL.
Area of benefit
CITY OF WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTMINSTER CATHEDRAL
CLERGY HOUSE
42 FRANCIS STREET
LONDON
SW1P 1QW
- Phone:
- 02077989059
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window