BOB CARTER MEMORIAL YOUTH AND LEISURE CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain a youth and leisure centre for the benefit of inhabitants of Drayton and the surrounding area, advancement of education and the provision of facilities for social welfare recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life of said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 02 September 1977: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY ROWLAND ANDERSON | Chair | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Harsley | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Anne Rudkin | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Rosina White | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Brown | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Ian Cunnison | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM EVERETT | Trustee | 20 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
THE PARISH COUNCIL OF DRAYTON | Trustee | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
HILARY DIANE KISBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.18k | £115.30k | £139.85k | £144.75k | £173.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.14k | £134.25k | £139.68k | £150.44k | £241.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 12TH JULY 1977
Charitable objects
TO BUILD AND ESTABLISH A YOUTH AND LEISURE CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DRAYTON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF DRAYTON,NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 HAREWOOD DRIVE
TAVERHAM
NORWICH
NR8 6XH
- Phone:
- 01603260029
- Email:
- bobcartercentre@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window