FRIENDS OF VALENCE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of The is to raise funds for, support and promote Valence School. Valence School is a Local Authority maintained Special Boarding and Day School for Children and Young People with Physical Disabilities Complex Medical Needs and Associated Learning Difficulties. The funds help provide for extra curricular activities, prizes and gifts for the students and capital projects for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 24 May 1978: Standard registration
- 24 March 2023: Funds received from 1137388 HENRY SURTEES FOUNDATION
- VALENCE SCHOOL PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Wenham | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saramia Sofia Piazza-Drew | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Ayles | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matt Strange | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Beaney | Trustee | 09 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.89k | £28.96k | £45.57k | £25.28k | £103.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.61k | £23.23k | £83.98k | £82.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 September 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH JANUARY 1976 AND AMENDED 21ST NOVEMBER 1976, AND 18TH JULY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF VALENCE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF VALENCE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Valence School
VALENCE SCHOOL
WESTERHAM ROAD
WESTERHAM
TN16 1QN
- Phone:
- 01959562156
- Email:
- friends@valence.kent.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window