THE JANE JASON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a grant making charity. Our trustees select projects to support in order to further our general charitable objects. We currently do not consider unsolicited applications for support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 June 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES PAUL JASON | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|||||||
KATIE SAMANTHA ELLISON | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES JASON | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MARK GUY JASON | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JANE NINOT JASON OBE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOHN JASON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £980 | £117 | £108 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.68k | £10.35k | £1.22k | £33.57k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 1978
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE WANT AND POVERTY. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION. (C) TO ADVANCE RELIGION. (D) ANY OTHER PURPOSE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
JANE JASON CHARITABLE TRUST
1 BELL STREET
LONDON
NW1 5BY
- Phone:
- 02072585858
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window