ASSOCIATION FOR INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY

Charity number: 277511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The AIA is the national organisation for people who share an interest in Britain's industrial past. It brings together people who are researching, recording, preserving and presenting the great variety of this country's industrial heritage.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £420,816
Total expenditure: £216,821

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 August 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jinyue Zhang Trustee 05 October 2024
None on record
Dr Pen Foreman Trustee 03 September 2023
NATIONAL COAL MINING MUSEUM FOR ENGLAND TRUST LTD
Received: On time
BRADFORD LGBTQ+ STRATEGIC PARTNERSHIP LTD.
Received: On time
Juan Manuel Cano Sanchiz Trustee 03 September 2023
None on record
Euan Humphreys Trustee 03 September 2023
None on record
Richard Vernon Trustee 25 September 2022
BRIGHTON TOY AND MODEL MUSEUM
Received: On time
THE SUSSEX INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY
Received: On time
Otis Roger Gilbert Trustee 25 September 2022
None on record
Geoffrey Wallis Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Zoe Arthurs Trustee 11 October 2020
None on record
Dr Ian West Trustee 02 September 2018
BIRCHMEADOW CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Received: On time
KEITH FALCONER Trustee 02 September 2018
None on record
JOHN JONES Trustee 25 August 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £218.43k £181.08k £57.39k £194.27k £420.82k
Total expenditure £197.09k £168.62k £163.19k £138.37k £216.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 St. Michaels Close
Madeley
TELFORD
Shropshire
TF7 5SD
Phone:
01952416026