THE WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 278321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Umbrella organisation for village based community activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,356
Total expenditure: £9,931

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • COMMUNITY COUNCIL (Working name)
  • WALSHAM OBSERVER (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Karen Quinn Trustee 26 June 2024
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time
Sarah Cousins Trustee 26 June 2024
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time
Robert Matthews Trustee 05 July 2023
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time
Nicholas Tuck Trustee 05 July 2023
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time
Ian Bartholomew Trustee 21 February 2020
THE THORPE WOODLANDS ADVENTURE CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time
Trevor Edward Roberts Trustee 21 February 2020
WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS SPORTS CLUB CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Received: On time
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time
Cheryl Joyce Bartholomew Trustee 21 February 2020
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time
Shirley White Trustee 21 February 2020
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time
David William Murray Trustee 21 February 2020
MEMORIAL HALL WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.73k £4.33k £5.25k £11.03k £3.36k
Total expenditure £4.03k £4.13k £6.66k £6.61k £9.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 UPPER MEADOW
WALSHAM-LE-WILLOWS
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
IP31 3AY
Phone:
01359 258349