CHARITY OF LADY CAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide funds to five nominated Church of England state schools in accordance with the provisions of the will of Lady Capel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Hounslow
- Kent
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 14 November 1980: Standard registration
- LADY CAPEL'S CHARITY (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Bailes | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Giles Anthony Fraser | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Caroline Helen Maude Hill | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DEREK BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ANTHONY TELFER SAYWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROBIN FREDERICK IAN GOODGAME | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE RICHARD CHESMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN NICHOLAS FLOYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MONICA ALICE BRIDGEWATER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/05/2020 | 23/05/2021 | 23/05/2022 | 23/05/2023 | 23/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.85k | £5.96k | £6.08k | £6.22k | £6.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.75k | £0 | £6.12k | £6.00k | £6.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 May 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 May 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 May 2022 | 24 April 2023 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 May 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 May 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 18TH AUGUST 1719 .
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT USE AND BENEFIT IN EQUAL SHARES OF SUCH OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITY SCHOOLS AS SHALL BE KEPT UP AND SUPPORTED AND SHALL TEACH THE FAITH AND THE FAITH AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND NAMELY KEW, BRENTFORD, RICHMOND,FAVERSHAM, MORTLAKE, HAMMERSMITH, EALING, CHELTENHAM AND TEWKESBURY, GLOUCESTER, HALTWISSLE ALIAS HALTWHISTLE AND PARISH OF ST. ANDREW, HOLBORN.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Gloucester Court
Kew Road
RICHMOND
Surrey
TW9 3EA
- Phone:
- 07947157080
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window