LONDON SEMINARY

Charity number: 281464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Inactive

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LTS (Working name)
  • LONDON THEOLOGICAL SEMINARY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev SPENCER REDMORE CUNNAH Chair
LONDON SEMINARY CIO
Received: On time
Benedict Bird Trustee 07 May 2019
LONDON SEMINARY CIO
Received: On time
EBENEZER REFORMED CHAPEL, LUTON
Received: On time
Rev HUGH COLLIER Trustee 18 November 2015
FUEL ALLOTMENT
Received: On time
Rev Gwynne Evans Trustee 17 April 2012
THE CONGREGATIONAL MEMORIAL HALL TRUST
Received: On time
THE BIBLE PREACHING TRUST
Received: On time
THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr DAVID JONATHAN EARL Trustee
LONDON SEMINARY CIO
Received: On time
BRIAN JOHN STEVENS Trustee
LONDON SEMINARY CIO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £160.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £216.23k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 06 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 20 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 09 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
104 HENDON LANE
LONDON
N3 3SQ
Phone:
02083467587