LEANDER (KINGSTON) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leander offers fun and challenging activities for boys and girls from the age of six, in accordance with the Policy, Organisation and Rules of the Scout Association. Young people get to try new activities, learn team building and leadership skills and discover their potential. The Group has a riverside headquarters with a large fleet of boats, allowing a full range of boating activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 28 September 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW DAVID JACKSON | Chair | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Connolly | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Sing | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Pullen | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Russell Constable | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elaine Johnson | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Thomas Burr | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PENNY D'SOUZA | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|||||
PAUL LOMAS-CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.21k | £60.32k | £38.61k | £41.37k | £45.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.98k | £14.70k | £56.78k | £33.24k | £39.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.02k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leander Sea Scouts
92 Lower Ham Road
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Surrey
KT2 5BB
- Phone:
- 020 8977 8305
- Email:
- info@leanderseascouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window