AGUDAS ISRAEL ORGANISATION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 290191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Acts As An Umbrella organisation. Provides advice. Makes grants to organisations and individuals

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £349,203
Total expenditure: £381,398

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 September 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN HEITNER Trustee 30 January 2025
BETH ABRAHAM SYNAGOGUE LIMITED
Received: On time
ADENFIRST LIMITED
Received: On time
ITZCHOK MEYER CYMERMAN TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
CANONSTATES LIMITED
Received: On time
COLEL POLEN KUPATH RAMBAN LIMITED
Received: On time
TRUEMART LIMITED
Received: On time
RUSSIAN IMMIGRANT AID FUND LIMITED
Received: On time
JOSEPH SCHLEIDER Trustee 29 March 2023
ZEIRE AGUDA
Received: On time
THE ZEIRE AGUDATH ISRAEL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
YESODEY HATORAH TRUST
Received: On time
HENRY BONDI Trustee 01 April 2022
B H GUR LIMITED
Received: On time
DENCOMMON LIMITED
Received: On time
KEREN HATORAH
Received: On time
RUSSIAN IMMIGRANT AID FUND LIMITED
Received: On time
ROBERT GRUSSGOTT Trustee 01 April 2022
UOHC PROPERTIES LTD
Received: On time
BIKUR CHOLIM LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ZEIRE AGUDATH ISRAEL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
A T.I.M.E. LIMITED
Received: On time
AGUDAS ISRAEL COMMUNITY SERVICES
Received: On time
THE UNION OF ORTHODOX HEBREW CONGREGATIONS
Received: On time
THE ELIEZER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BRITEFIELD TRUST
Received: On time
Rabbi Jacob Meir Rosenbaum Trustee 10 December 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £98.06k £56.52k £73.67k £105.48k £349.20k
Total expenditure £94.77k £48.89k £64.52k £66.10k £381.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.26k £12.35k £1.66k N/A £27.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 05 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Agudas Israel Of Great Britain
97 Stamford Hill
LONDON
N16 5DN
Phone:
07966153532
Website:

No information available