FRIENDS OF BARNES HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
London Borough of Richmond. Supporting patients of Barnes Hospital (a Mental Health facility) and people with a health need in the community in the area covered. Some active fundraising. Donations, including legacies, are received from members of the Friends and from local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 09 November 1984: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF BARNES HOSPITAL (Working name)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF BARNES HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHLEEN SHELDON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
William Arnold | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Timothy Marcus Catchpole | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Jeffrey Herbert | Trustee | 15 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE LUCY HILLIER | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Philip Halford | Trustee | 16 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEIRDRE MUNRO | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH ALAN COOK | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SLEIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ANN MCNULTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHLEEN HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.78k | £3.66k | £2.68k | £3.58k | £6.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.26k | £8.93k | £12.19k | £10.11k | £9.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH AUGUST 1984
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
BARNES HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of Barnes Hospital
Barnes Hospital
South Worple Way
London
SW14 8SU
- Phone:
- 02035133630
- Email:
- info@fobh.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window