COBHAM HALL HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the purposes of the advancement of general education in relation to horticulture and related matters generally including horticulture and garden buildings of all natures and in particular the lands and tenements including buildings at or near the mansion house known as Cobham Hall in Cobham ,Kent and the protection of their natural aspect and surroundings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 08 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
rosemary dymond | Chair | 06 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
PAUL ANTHONY KINGMAN | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
KEITH GEORGE HILLS | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
terence curran | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
brian william jelley | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
MARTIN DAVID PENNELL | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||
SARAH MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||
LYN ELLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.35k | £1.61k | £1.80k | £6.18k | £4.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.38k | £14.80k | £2.30k | £778 | £6.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 JUL 1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO HORTICULTURAL ARCHITECTURAL AND RELATED MATTERS GENERALLY INCLUDING HORTICULTURAL AND GARDEN BUILDINGS OF ALL NATURES AND MORE GENERALLY BUILDINGS OF PARTICULAR ARCHITECUTURAL OR HISTORIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
COBHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABERG-WAUN
STACK LANE
HARTLEY
LONGFIELD
DA3 8BL
- Phone:
- 01474704175
- Email:
- BRIANJELLEY@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window