THE BROOKING ARCHITECTURAL MUSEUM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Trust is to advance the education of the public in the architecture of the United Kingdom and including specifically the preservation and maintenance of the Brooking Collection. The activities of the charity are governed by a deed of trust dated 11 April 1986.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 May 1986: Standard registration
- 24 February 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 24 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1155363 The Brooking
- THE BROOKING COLLECTION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | 28/02/2012 | 28/02/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.05k | £5.18k | £20.40k | £28.50k | £4.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £5.43k | £20.06k | £14.52k | £18.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | 30 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | 12 April 2012 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE BROOKING COLLECTION FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window