THE FAN MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public with particular regard to fans, fan making and the history and development thereof.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 October 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Stuart Harris | Chair | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr PIETER THOMAS VAN DER MERWE | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY BARNES | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY ADRIAN JOHN BURNETT | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ZEITLIN | Trustee | 20 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MORDAUNT-CROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELENE ESTHER ALEXANDER FRSA MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £331.60k | £365.00k | £300.54k | £358.39k | £321.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £390.02k | £248.64k | £278.84k | £308.90k | £288.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £68.93k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCOPRTATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO FANS AND FAM MAKING AND THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fan Museum
12 Crooms Hill
Greenwich
London
SE10 8ER
- Phone:
- 02083051441
- Email:
- info@thefanmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window