NORTH WILTSHIRE ACCESS FOR THE DISABLED GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awaiting requests for financial support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 19 October 1987: Standard registration
- 27 November 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 27 November 2015: Funds transferred to 277534 THE CHIPPENHAM AND DISTRICT TRANSPORT FOR THE DISA...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £824 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 26 November 2015 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 30 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 21 November 2013 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 11 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH AUGUST 1987
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF HANDICAPPED AND DISABLED PEOPLE BY IMPROVING THE ACCESSIBILITY OF PLACES IN THE PARLIAMENTARY CONSTITUENCY OF NORTH WILTSHIRE. (A) SEEK TO RAISE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS, ASPIRATIONS AND ACHIEVEMENTS OF DISABLED PEOPLE. (B) SEEK TO ENSURE FOR DISABLED PEOPLE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF SAFE AND CONVENIENT PASSAGE THROUGHOUT THE DISTRICT, INCLUDING ACCESS TO BUILDINGS. (C) SEEK TO ENSURE THAT THE STATUTORY RESPONSIBILITIES WITH REGARD TO DISABLED PEOPLE ARE OBSERVED. (D) SEEK TO SECURE THE PROVISION OF FUNDS NECESSARY TO PROMOTE THE ABOVE.
Area of benefit
PARLIAMENTARY CONSTITUENCY OF NORTH WILTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window