GLOUCESTERSHIRE AVIATION COLLECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to preserve the aeronautical heritage of Gloucestershire for the benefit of the public and to exhibit to members of the public materials related to flying, the air and space industry and its associated technology by means of the establishment and maintenance of an aviation museum and other permanent and temporary exhibitions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 November 1987: Standard registration
- JET AGE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Godfrey | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Woolfrey | Trustee | 13 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Oliver Towers | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Martin Renshaw | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthony Sangwine | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Campbell | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Graham George Howell | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||
TONY MACKINNON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.76k | £122.07k | £120.17k | £144.44k | £93.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.42k | £66.13k | £55.85k | £76.45k | £93.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.50k | £37.91k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH JUNE 1987 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 APR 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE AERONAUTICAL HERITAGE OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. B) TO EXHIBIT TO MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC MATERIALS RELATED TO FLYING THE AIR AND SPACE INDUSTRY AND ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENAANCE OF AN AVIATION MUSEUM AND OTHER TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT EXHIBITIONS.
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 3
Ambrose House Meteor Court
Barnett Way
Barnwood
GLOUCESTER
GL4 3GG
- Phone:
- 01452308153
- Email:
- contact@jetagemuseum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window