DRIVING MOBILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Driving Mobility is a network of independent organisations who offer professional high quality information, advice and assessment to individuals who have a medical condition or who are recovering from an accident or injury which may affect their ability to drive, access or egress a motor vehicle.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,576,338
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.56m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £13.14k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,270,513
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.27m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,563,199 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.27m | |
Retained for future use | £305.83k |
People

9 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- THE FORUM OF MOBILITY CENTRES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Barry Clift | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Corke | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Bateman | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natascha McAllister | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leanne Grose | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Blythe | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Alcock | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Roberts | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Parker | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sian Mitchell | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Swain | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sean Lawrence | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11m | £989.79k | £630.83k | £1.58m | £1.58m | |
|
Total expenditure | £900.00k | £683.47k | £789.47k | £1.27m | £1.27m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.03m | £914.22k | £491.19k | £1.35m | £1.56m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £643 | £11 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.11m | £988.78k | £630.68k | £1.56m | £1.56m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.21k | £363 | £135 | £13.14k | £13.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £11 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £900.00k | £556.82k | £789.47k | £1.27m | £1.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £17.77k | £20.35k | £27.36k | £42.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £41.50k | £0 | £148.81k | £183.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £126.65k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £637.35k | £761.01k | £864.32k | £1.03m | £1.40m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £100 | £100 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.13m | £1.28m | £2.50m | £3.14m | £3.09m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £96.11k | £62.46k | £1.55m | £2.05m | £604.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/11/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL AND COGNITIVE IMPAIRMENTS, AS WELL AS THOSE PEOPLE WITH IMPAIRED MOBILITY, OR THOSE WHO MAY BE VULNERABLE TO SUCH CONDITIONS, BY REASON OF AGE OR INFIRMITY IN ANY WAY WHICH SHALL FOR THE TIME BEING BE CHARITABLE IN LAW; AND (2) TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF STANDARDS OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY AND TRAVEL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Carriage Works
Moresk Road
TRURO
TR1 1DG
- Phone:
- 01872672520
- Email:
- info@drivingmobility.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window