Corby District Girlguiding

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Girlguiding activities for girls aged 5 to 18 through Rainbow, Brownie, Guide and Ranger units throughout Corby.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 17 March 1964: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING CORBY AND ROCKINGHAM FOREST (Working name)
- GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION CORBY AND ROCKINGHAM FOREST DIV (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Jacob | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH BELL | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Claire Marsh | Trustee | 14 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.07k | £6.68k | £329 | £2.60k | £4.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.11k | £3.28k | £3.68k | £2.55k | £3.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AGREEMENT DATED 14TH JULY 1961 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1938.
Charitable objects
GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION CORBY AND ROCKINGHAM FOREST DIVISION
Area of benefit
CORBY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Pound Close
Great Oakley
Corby
NN18 8JA
- Phone:
- 07733261340
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window