BOVEY TRACEY EXHIBITION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS FOR STUDENTS OVER 16 YEARS LIVING IN THE PARISH OF BOVEY TRACEY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 10 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Bray | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avril Kerswell | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sue Foot | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Cllr George John Gribble | Trustee |
|
||||||
JILL COOMBES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.06k | £2.14k | £2.18k | £2.24k | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £2.02k | £2.02k | £2.53k | £46 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 February 2024 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13TH OCTOBER 1910
Charitable objects
THE AWARD OF JUNIOR SECONDARY, TECHNICAL AND SENIOR EXHIBITIONS AT APPROVED PLACES OF HIGHER EDUCATION AND SUBJECT TO CERTAIN SPECIFIED CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BOVEY TRACEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 St. Pauls Close
Bovey Tracey
NEWTON ABBOT
Devon
TQ13 9JD
- Phone:
- 07888848321
- Email:
- SUE.FOOT@DEVON.GOV.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window