MILL HALL ORAL SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF LTD

Charity number: 307018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Charity is dormant.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 1987: Standard registration
  • 09 February 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TIMOTHY POLACK Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Robin Paul Askew Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Peter Robson Trustee 27 January 2021
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS AND NON-MAINTAINED SPECIAL SCHOOLS
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 09 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE WITH THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AT MILL HALL ORAL SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF LIMITED OR ELIGIBLE TO ATTEND THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 24 June 1987 : Standard registration
  • 09 February 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Mary Hare School
Arlington Manor
Snelsmore Common
Newbury
RG14 3BQ
Phone:
01635244229