SAMUEL BUTLER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 307908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The promotion of education of young persons, in need of financial assistance, who are or have been for not less than two years resident or at a county or voluntary school in the area of benefit, being parishes covering mostly Tower Hamlets.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,304
Total expenditure: £26,869

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London
  • City Of Westminster
  • Kent
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev PETER MCGEARY Chair
THE HENDERSON CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ORGELBÜCHLEIN PROJECT
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY CABLE STREET
Received: On time
Rev Ryan Gabriel Rodrigues Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Darren Wolf Trustee 10 June 2021
NORTON FOLGATE ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ALL SAINTS SPITALFIELDS
Received: On time
Rev Erin Clark Trustee 21 March 2019
MISS VAUGHAN'S SPITALFIELDS CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev David Armstrong Trustee 06 November 2018
None on record
Revd Richard Springer Trustee 14 October 2018
ST CHAD'S COLLEGE DURHAM
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GEORGE-IN-THE-EAST WITH ST. PAUL
Received: On time
Rev Jonathan Beswick Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
Rev GRAHAM HUNTER Trustee 19 September 2016
STREET LEVEL TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 1649 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH CHRIST CHURCH, HOXTON(DIOCESE OF LONDON)
Received: On time
Rev Philip Williams Trustee 06 July 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF POPLAR (ALL SAINTS AND ST NICHOLAS)
Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
JACQUELINE DIANE DRIVER BSC HONS Trustee 18 December 2014
HACKNEY PARISH ALMSHOUSES CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Richard Bray Trustee 03 September 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE'S, LIMEHOUSE
Received: 18 days late
CARE FOR LIMEHOUSE PARISH CHURCH (ST ANNE'S) COMMERCIAL ROAD TRUST (USUALLY KNOWN AS CARE FOR ST ANNE'S)
Received: On time
LONDON GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP
Received: 41 days late
Rev TREVOR FRANCIS CRITCHLOW Trustee 10 October 2011
STEPNEY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE RATCLIFF EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DUNSTAN AND ALL SAINTS, STEPNEY
Received: On time
The Portal Trust
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARY BASTOW
Received: On time
THE ST DUNSTAN'S AND ALL SAINTS STEPNEY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN KITCHEN Trustee 10 October 2011
None on record
Rev LAURA JANE JORGENSEN Trustee
THE ALDGATE AND ALLHALLOWS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ALDGATE FREEDOM FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev SIMON JAMES GRIGG Trustee
ST CLEMENT DANES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.12k £19.48k £20.14k £21.08k £21.30k
Total expenditure £38.45k £18.48k £25.01k £27.97k £26.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
37 KENILWORTH ROAD
BOW
LONDON
E3 5RH
Phone:
02089816612