PREP SCHOOLS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£21,236,000
Donations and legacies | £590.00k | |
Charitable activities | £19.48m | |
Other trading activities | £351.00k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £814.00k |
Total expenditure:
£21,212,000
Raising funds | £71.00k | |
Charitable activities | £21.14m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £71.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £21.14m | |
Retained for future use | £24.00k |
People

334 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 3 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- East Sussex
- Gloucestershire
- Northumberland
- Oxfordshire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 01 October 1969: Standard registration
- 23 May 2018: Funds received from 312085 BARFIELD SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
- ASHDOWN HOUSE (Working name)
- CHANDLINGS (Working name)
- KITEBROOK HOUSE (Working name)
- MOWDEN HALL (Working name)
- OLD MALTHOUSE (Working name)
- COTHILL EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- COTHILL HOUSE SCHOOL LIMITED (Previous name)
- COTHILL TRUST (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Elizabeth Ann McKendrick | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||
James Barnes | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Colin Hargreaves | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Mark Beard | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Jason Houlden-Stanley | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Henrietta Lindsell | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Canon Francis William Miles Burkitt | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Alison Jane Derham | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Lucinda Mary Elisabeth Newcombe | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Julian Peter Spencer | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||
WILLIAM HUGH PITMAN | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Toby James Gibson | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacqualyn Christina Pain | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Countess Peta Martine Darnley | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.44m | £19.50m | £19.01m | £20.50m | £21.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.95m | £21.56m | £18.23m | £19.18m | £21.21m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.18m | £174.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £222.00k | £1.43m | £1.70m | £968.00k | £590.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £493.00k | £211.00k | £158.00k | £251.00k | £351.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £19.62m | £17.85m | £17.05m | £19.28m | £19.48m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £1.11m | £12.00k | £101.00k | £0 | £814.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £22.81m | £21.41m | £17.49m | £19.08m | £21.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £111.00k | £152.00k | £182.00k | £66.00k | £71.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £69.00k | £56.00k | £52.00k | £55.00k | £61.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £25.00k | £0 | £564.00k | £32.00k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £41.46m | £41.12m | £34.09m | £35.67m | £40.85m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.40m | £1.67m | £8.58m | £4.90m | £3.70m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.48m | £9.45m | £8.57m | £5.15m | £9.10m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 July 2020 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION, INCORPORATED 29TH AUGUST 1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 DECEMBER 2007 as amended on 04 Dec 2017 as amended on 20 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PREPARATORY EDUCATION AT MODERATE COST. AS ANCILLARY TO THE ABOVE:- TO CONDUCT COTHILL HOUSE SCHOOL, NEAR ABINGDON. BERKSHIRE, AS A PREPARATORY SCHOOL FOR CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF FOURTEEN YEARS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Cothill
ABINGDON
OX13 6JN
- Phone:
- 01865390720
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window