HEAGE WINDMILL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The conservation and restoration of Heage Windmill. To open it to the public at regular intervals and to widen the knowledge about windmills and the milling process.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £50,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
58 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 20 November 1997: Standard registration
- HEAGE WINDMILL SOCIETY (Working name)
- HEAGE WINDMILL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Daniel McDonald | Chair | 27 January 2025 |
|
|||||
TREVOR MARK AINSWORTH | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Gordon Campbell | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Eccleston | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Mucklestone | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Moss | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Ramsbottom | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Roger Clive Hatcher | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Nigel Weaving | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FREDRICK GIFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.95k | £14.01k | £29.93k | £29.05k | £133.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.61k | £12.37k | £11.53k | £12.95k | £143.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.27k | £500 | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 January 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 December 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20 SEP 2016 as amended on 08 Nov 2021 as amended on 02 Nov 2021 as amended on 08 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SECURING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION CONSERVATION MAINTENANCE PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT IMPROVEMENT AND USE OF HEAGE WINDMILL AND ITS RELATED OUTBUILDINGS. 2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE USE FUNCTION DEVELOPMENT HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF MILLS AND MILLING IN GENERAL AND HEAGE WINDMILL IN PARTICULAR
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Elmwood Drive
ALFRETON
Derbyshire
DE55 7QJ
- Phone:
- 07970710041
- Email:
- h.secretary.w@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window