THE JUDGE'S LODGING TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates The Judge's Lodging Museum, a restored Victorian courthouse and accommodation for visiting judges. It also houses a substantial local history collection. It exists to interpret and preserve these, actively collects related objects and has a range of educational services, displays and events to support them. It also runs the town's Tourist Information Centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,935 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Powys
Governance
- 06 May 1997: Standard registration
- PRESTEIGNE SHIRE HALL MUSEUM TRUST (Working name)
- THE JUDGES LODGING (Working name)
- THE PRESTEIGNE SHIRE HALL MUSEUM TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Thornton | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Paice | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Timothy Stenson Hodgetts | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Michael Felgate | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Helen Frederica Smith | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DIANE ROSEMARY GWILT | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.64k | £162.60k | £79.37k | £67.44k | £85.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.43k | £113.60k | £81.10k | £88.05k | £93.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £141.63k | £40.00k | £38.77k | £23.98k | £11.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 March 2024 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 OCT 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 MAR 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 APR 2016 as amended on 27 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC A MUSEUM ATTRACTION ESTABLISHED WITHIN THE BUILDINGS KNOWN AS THE SHIRE HALL, PRESTEIGNE, POWYS.
Area of benefit
POWYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE JUDGES LODGING
SHIREHALL
BROAD STREET
PRESTEIGNE
LD8 2AD
- Phone:
- 01544260650
- Email:
- info@judgeslodging.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window