EDMONDS AND COLES SCHOLARSHIPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY MAKES FINANCIAL AWARDS FOR ANY EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES. FOR EXAMPLE, SMALL GRANTS FOR THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS OR EQUIPMENT NEEDED FOR A COURSE OF EDUCATION OR TRAINING OR HELP WITH TRAVEL COSTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 December 1962: Standard registration
- EDMONDS AND COLES CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachael Samantha Jones | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Anne Killen | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Michael David Pruett | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Smith | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Anna Margaret Hannam | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Sean McCullough | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline-Jane Duckworth | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £12.10k | £16.22k | £10.16k | £13.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.85k | £12.68k | £7.93k | £6.88k | £17.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 JUNE 1986 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES DATED 25 JUNE 1990 AND 27 FEBRUARY 1997. RESOLUTION PASSED AT MEETINGS HELD 25 APRIL 2007, 24 OCTOBER 2007 AND 23 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE AND HAVE FOR THREE YEARS BEEN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
HENBURY, WESTBURY-ON-TRYM AND HORFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SOCIETY OF MERCHANT VENTURERS
MERCHANTS HALL
THE PROMENADE
CLIFTON DOWN
BRISTOL
BS8 3NH
- Phone:
- 01179738058
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window