WILLIAM DAVIS'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312314
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support for extra-curricular activities in schools in the benefit area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £33,795
Total expenditure: £35,191

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Hackney
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 October 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE DAVIS TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN HENRY WILLIAM DAVIS Chair
None on record
Charles Gould Trustee 14 November 2021
None on record
Alexandra Gould Trustee 14 November 2021
None on record
ELSPETH MITCHELL Trustee 18 March 2018
None on record
SEAN DAVIS Trustee 18 March 2018
None on record
KAY LOUISE BOAG Trustee 18 March 2018
None on record
Nicola Jane Daubeny Trustee 26 October 2014
None on record
MARK WILLIAM DAVIS Trustee
None on record
LYNN ELIZABETH MAXWELL Trustee
1001FONTAINES UK
Received: On time
WALTER WILLIAM DAVIS Trustee
None on record
FIONA SAUNDERS WATSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.69k £17.88k £18.66k £27.74k £33.80k
Total expenditure £23.76k £13.23k £19.40k £1.12k £35.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 November 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 November 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Coglan House
Old Monmouth Road
LONGHOPE
Gloucestershire
GL17 0NZ
Phone:
01452830245
Email:
No information available