SCHOOL OF INDUSTRY OR GIRLS' SCHOOL

Charity number: 312808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants for the benefit of young persons resident in the area of Hampton and Hampton Hill who are under 21 years of age and who need financial assistance towards payment of fees, travelling or maintenance expenses or by such other means while undertaking an apprenticeship or attending college/university.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £7,401
Total expenditure: £6,278

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Richmond Upon Thames

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SCHOOL OF INDUSTRY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DEREK NEIL WINTERBURN BSC MA Chair
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Ronald Pettit Trustee 18 March 2025
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
SARAH SELVANATHAN Trustee 03 October 2023
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev DONNA WILLIAMS Trustee 22 June 2021
ROOM FOR WORK
Received: On time
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
PAULA WILLIAMS Trustee 31 March 2020
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS', HAMPTON
Received: On time
Dr DAVID WILE Trustee 01 October 2019
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES HAMPTON HILL
Received: On time
Rev BEN LOVELL Trustee 18 September 2017
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
STUART NIGEL LEAMY Trustee 26 June 2017
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
HAMPTON POOL TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN SOONES JP Trustee 01 May 2012
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
ANNE WALKER Trustee 01 May 2012
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
MRS S NICHOLSON Trustee
HAMPTON & MOLESEY RIVERSIDE TRUST
Received: On time
LINDEN HALL COMMUNITY CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
HAMPTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
BARBARA ANNE HEALEY Trustee
THE HAMPTON WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.67k £6.77k £6.89k £7.09k £7.40k
Total expenditure £4.60k £4.15k £4.23k £4.78k £6.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
SCHOOL OF INDUSTRY CHARITY
1A JUBILEE HOUSE
ASHLEY ROAD
HAMPTON
MIDDLESEX
TW12 2HX
Phone:
02089412016
Website:

No information available