THE CARNEGIE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the trust is to raise and provide funds for the provision of sailing and other recreational facilities for disabled and/or disadvantaged children of the United Kingdom
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 June 1984: Standard registration
- 11 May 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 11 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1132249 FOWLER SMITH AND JONES TRUST
- THE VICTORY TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £106 | £50.08k | £78 | £81 | £84 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 16 April 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 16 April 2021 | 381 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 MAY 1984, AS AMENDED ON 1ST MARCH 2000 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
TO BE PAID OR APPLIED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE THERETO THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND SHALL BE APPLIED IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL, AND IN PARTICULAR SAILING, FACILITIES, FOR DISABLED OR DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 18, AND RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS IDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window