THE WOOTTON GRANGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing religion and education, protecting health and relieving sickness and poverty. Support of charities and individuals involved in Christian ministry; support of a church in Bulgaria, seeking to advance the Christian religion and to relieve poverty among old people and in Bulgarian orphanages. Providing accomodation for retired Christian workers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 24 June 1986: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLAN FRANK SIMMONS | Chair |
|
||||||
JONATHAN MICHAEL HARMAN SIMMONS | Trustee | 14 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN SIMMONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATIE ANN GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDER WARING SIMMONS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.40k | £96.36k | £208.57k | £57.10k | £6.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.96k | £49.87k | £93.25k | £178.90k | £67.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 APRIL 1986.
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
North End Cottage
North End
Damerham
FORDINGBRIDGE
Hampshire
SP6 3HA
- Phone:
- 01725 518044
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window