THE CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING COUNCIL OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 327340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting the proclamation of the Christian Gospel through the electronic media. Organising conferences and giving awards for excellence in broadcasting and related matters. Support of independent Christian broadcasters. Communication with Ofcom and other Government related agencies.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £4,212

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 February 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CBC (Working name)
  • THE CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING COUNCIL (OF THE UNITED KINGDOM) (Previous name)
  • THE CHRISTIAN BROADCASTING COUNCIL OF GREAT BRITAIN (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter David Wooding Trustee 19 January 2023
HARALAN POPOV CENTRE
Received: On time
Roger John Bolton Trustee 19 January 2023
None on record
Rev Jonathan Laurence Alderton-Ford Trustee 14 October 2021
None on record
Christopher John Cole Trustee 26 October 2020
CROSS RHYTHMS
Received: On time
ALIVE IN THE SPIRIT
Received: On time
SPIRIT OF PLYMOUTH (RADIO) LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ANGEL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
OLAVE MARY CRAUFURD SNELLING Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25 £25 £39.90k £562 £0
Total expenditure £86 £406 £1.92k £3.97k £4.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28, Old Park Road
Peverell
Plymouth
Devon
PL3 4PY
Phone:
01752 225623
Website:

cbc.org.uk