PUBLIC ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to help people make great places to live, work and play in. Beam aims: * To create better understanding about the importance of the arts and good design; * To make stronger connections between professionals and the public; and * To celebrate the arts and good design in places and spaces as a powerful contributor to personal, economic and community wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £88,058 from 9 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 September 1987: Standard registration
- BEAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sanaa Shaikh | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Richmond | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henri Harrison Pearson | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Entwistle | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bongani Elton Muchemwa | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ball | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Watson | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £364.02k | £298.55k | £300.47k | £241.90k | £115.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £360.82k | £275.03k | £294.93k | £243.26k | £146.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £128.89k | £233.84k | £186.11k | £88.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 SEPTEMBER 1986 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 DECEMBER 1986, 2 FEBRUARY 1987, 17 SEPTEMBER 1987, 23 FEBRUARY 1993, 5 NOVEMBER 1997, 5 DECEMBER 2006 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
(1) TO ESTABLISH AND PROMOTE AND TO ENCOURAGE THE ESTABLISHMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE COMMISSIONING AND PUBLIC DISPLAY OF ALL FORMS OF ART IN PUBLIC PLACES, AND IN THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO ENTER INTO SUCH COMMISSIONS. (2) TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION, APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OF ART IN PUBLIC PLACES AND THE ENVIRONMENT, OF THE ARTIST IN THE SKILLS AND ABILITIES REQUIRED FOR THE PURPOSE OF WORKING IN PUBLIC PLACES, OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OF THE VALUE OF A QUALITY ENVIRONMENT AND THE RESPONSIBILITY TO PROTECT AND SUSTAIN THIS ENVIRONMENT FOR THE FUTURE.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Art House
Drury Lane
Wakefield
WF1 2TE
- Phone:
- 07718564376
- Email:
- contact@beam.uk.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window