BILLINGSGATE SEAFOOD TRAINING SCHOOL

Charity number: 1069809

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educating young people about the benefits of eating seafood as part of a healthy diet.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £426,408
Total expenditure: £374,431

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Heather Garrick Trustee 08 December 2021
None on record
Ian Philip Howard Arnold Trustee 04 October 2021
ST MICHAEL'S TRUST
Received: On time
THE UNITED KINGDOM ASSOCIATES OF THE BERMUDA INSTITUTE OF OCEAN SCIENCES
Received: On time
Nigel Bankes Trustee 13 March 2019
None on record
William Stabb Mills Trustee 28 August 2018
GRESHAM'S SCHOOL
Received: On time
Daniel Ritchie Trustee 28 August 2018
None on record
FRED STROYAN Trustee 10 June 2002
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £467.69k £480.96k £397.52k £361.48k £426.41k
Total expenditure £491.91k £484.79k £461.07k £394.71k £374.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023
Annual return 31 December 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022
Annual return 31 December 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021
Annual return 31 December 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OFFICE 30
BILLINGSGATE MARKET
TRAFALGAR WAY
LONDON
E14 5ST
Phone:
02075173548