THE FENELEY LIBRARY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of education, including the maintenance and development of a library and the preservation of the archives relating to the Centre for Medieval and Renaissance Studies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 05 June 1998: Standard registration
- 01 September 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 September 2017: Funds transferred to 1086407 MIDDLEBURY COLLEGE UK TRUST LIMITED
- CMRS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.38k | £58.09k | £17.58k | £24.50k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | £78 | £143 | £49 | £4.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 14 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 11 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JANUARY 1998.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN SUCH A MANNER AS IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window