THE GOSPEL MAGAZINE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the trust is the publication of the Gospel Magazine, which is believed to be the oldest religious periodical still being published. The bi-monthly magazine is non-denominational, seeking to present the Lord Jesus Christ as the only hope for a lost world, the only saviour of sinners; to edify the people of God; and to promote unity among believers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Rev EDWARD JOHN MALCOLM | Chair |
|
||||||||||||||
Robert John Hooper | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
KEVIN MCGRANE | Trustee | 02 May 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||
John Dearing | Trustee | 02 May 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||
PHILIP STUART LIEVESLEY | Trustee | 22 September 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||
James North | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.43k | £8.31k | £3.11k | £2.70k | £1.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.08k | £7.77k | £7.71k | £7.19k | £8.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JANUARY 1906.
Charitable objects
TO EXPOUND, PROPAGATE, DEFEND AND DISSEMINATE THOSE REVEALED SCRIPTURE TRUTHS WHICH ARE THEOLOGICALLY AND POPULARLY KNOWN AS 'THE DOCTRINES OF GRACE' AS OPPOSED TO THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ROME, OF ANGLICAN SACERDOTALISM,RATIONALISM,ARIANISM,UNITARIANISM OR SOCIANISM,PELAGIANISM AND ARMINIANISM AND WHILE MAINTAINING IN THE SAID MAGAZINE THE SAID 'DOCTRINES OF GRACE' TO EMPHASISE THEREIN THE EXPERIMENTAL AND PRACTICAL EFFECTS AND FRUIT OF A LIVING SPIRIT WROUGHT FAITH IN THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND THE TRUSTEES SHALL GENERALLY ADMINISTER AND CONDUCT THE SAID MAGAZINE WITH A VIEW TO THE SPIRITUAL EDIFICATION OF GOD'S ELECT REDEEMED, QUICKENED AND CALLED PEOPLE SO THAT THE TRIUNE JEHOVAH MAY BE GLORIFIED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 CHAPLINS
KIRBY CROSS
FRINTON-ON-SEA
CO13 0RU
- Phone:
- 01255679572
- Email:
- philip.lievesley@sky.com
- Website:
-
gospelmagazine.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window