BROMLEY HOUSE LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is:- 1. That of carrying on a subscription library 2. To preserve for the benefit of the public the building and gardens known as Bromley House.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 19 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Timothy Ware | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Erin Connelly | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Michaela Butter | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Hodson | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Catharine Arnold | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ANDREW TUCKER | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Martin Gorman | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Harrison | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||
David Anthony Hoskins | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
MARTIN STOTT | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £494.04k | £364.45k | £316.48k | £323.07k | £348.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.10k | £292.30k | £389.83k | £339.73k | £297.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 29 MAY 1998 AND 30 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 OCT 2017 as amended on 16 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE AND THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE LITERATURE FOR THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A LIBRARY TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND KNOWLEDGE OF LITERATURE AND ALL ARTISTIC AND SCIENTIFIC SUBJECTS AND BY PROVIDING LIBRARY FACILITIES FOR REFERENCE AND RESEARCH FACILITIES TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE BUILDING AND GARDENS KNOWN AS BROMLEY HOUSE, BEING A PLACE OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST, VALUE AND BEAUTY
Area of benefit
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROMLEY HOUSE LIBRARY
Bromley House
Angel Row
Nottingham
NG1 6HL
- Phone:
- 01159473134
- Email:
- enquiries@bromleyhouse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window