THE STOWE SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation's principal objective is to assist Stowe School in the provision of bursaries, scholarships and prizes for the pupils for the public benefit. Additionally it provides funds for the improvement of facilities offered by the School either by way of new buildings or improved sports and cultural facilities for the public benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£3,911,730
Donations and legacies | £3.01m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £898.45k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,471,760
Raising funds | £26.17k | |
Charitable activities | £5.45m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,922,285 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £26.17k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.45m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £26.17k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.45m | |
Retained for future use | £362.26k |
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 10 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR S C CREEDY SMITH | Chair | 14 June 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Simon Jeffrey Cope | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathryn Matthews | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Saunders Watson | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
NICHOLAS VERNEY BSc | Trustee | 11 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
PATRICK JOHN RICHARD STOPFORD BAOxon CFA | Trustee | 21 March 2014 |
|
|||||||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN TATE BA MIMC | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
Dr Anthony Wallersteiner MA, PHD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
JONATHAN MICHAEL ARUNDELL BEWES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05m | £1.44m | £1.60m | £2.13m | £3.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £561.73k | £647.21k | £2.32m | £1.26m | £5.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.30m | £2.86m | £2.90m | £3.32m | £3.01m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £1.56m | £1.68m | £1.62m | £1.59m | £702.46k | |
|
Income - Investment | £304.37k | £257.10k | £309.58k | £402.24k | £898.45k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £883.41k | £0 | £85.00k | £10.12k | £132.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £495.64k | £570.66k | £2.23m | £1.15m | £5.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £66.09k | £76.56k | £91.78k | £103.50k | £26.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.12k | £6.30k | £7.80k | £8.64k | £9.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £481.98k | £554.12k | £2.21m | £1.13m | £5.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £66.09k | £76.56k | £91.78k | £103.50k | £26.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £22.68m | £26.33m | £26.34m | £28.40m | £28.85m | |
|
Other assets | £112.66k | £649.56k | £672.73k | £1.14m | £1.06m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.69k | £14.70k | £18.49k | £17.30k | £19.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JUL 1998 AS AMENDED ON 05 NOV 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 DEC 2021 AS AMENDED ON 02 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS NET INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES AND FACILITIES AT STOWE SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER SCHOOL WITHIN THE STOWE GROUP OF SCHOOLS; (B) THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, GRANTS, LOANS AND OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PUPILS AND PROSPECTIVE PUPILS OF STOWE SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER SCHOOL WITHIN THE STOWE GROUP OF SCHOOLS UPON SUCH TERMS AND SUBJECT TO SUCH RESTRICTIONS OR CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT; (C) THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SOCIAL WELFARE OF PUPILS AT STOWE SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER SCHOOL WITHIN THE STOWE GROUP OF SCHOOLS, INCLUDING RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, WHICH WILL ASSIST IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES; (D) THE PROVISION OF ANY OTHER FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR OR ASSISTANCE TO STOWE SCHOOL OR ANY OTHER SCHOOL WITHIN THE STOWE GROUP OF SCHOOLS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT. PROVIDED THAT FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS THE REFERENCE TO THE STOWE GROUP OF SCHOOLS SHALL BE TAKEN ONLY TO INCLUDE THOSE SCHOOLS WHICH ARE OWNED AND RUN BY THE REGISTERED CHARITY STOWE SCHOOL LIMITED AND WHICH ARE BASED IN THE UK
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE STOWE)
Linked charities
- 10 May 2002 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stowe School
Stowe
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 5EH
- Phone:
- 01280818222
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window