Strategic Council

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Religious activities Community and charitable Support Media Outreach activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 April 1999: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 October 2011: Re-registered
- International Ministerial Alliance of Churches (Working name)
- Kingdom Life Prophetic Ministries (Working name)
- CHRIST ALIVE PROPHETIC MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- CHRIST LIFE WORSHIP CENTRE (Previous name)
- KINGDOM LIFE PROPHETIC MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- SAVEWAY CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sarah Omorogbe | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev JAMES LARBI | Trustee | 27 October 2011 |
|
|||||
BISHOP JOEL OLUWAFEMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.40k | £3.40k | £3.80k | £4.00k | £1.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.60k | £4.60k | £4.50k | £3.94k | £2.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 25TH MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 5 DECEMBER 2004. as amended on 20 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH DECLARED IN CLAUSE E AND IN SO DOING TO TEACH, PREACH AND PROPAGATE THE TOTAL UNADULTERATED AND UNALLOYED GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST BOTH WITHIN AND OUTSIDE THE UNITED KINGDOM I:E EUROPE AND ANYWHERE AN OPPORTUNITY PRESENTS ITSELF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Kimpton Road
LONDON
SE5 7EA
- Phone:
- 07402741263
- Email:
- strategiccouncil21@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window