THE FRIENDS OF RINGWOOD PARISH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities to support the maintenance, repair and improvement of the fabric of the Parish Church. Activities include Talks with Suppers, Afternoon Teas with a talk or demonstration, Concerts, Outings etc. We have built a toilet block, installed CCTV, helped with cost of new lighting system, repaired the roof of the Tower and reinstated an important old brass memorial.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 06 April 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR PETER GEOFFREY GOODWIN | Chair | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Russell John Doody | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS SALLY BOARD | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|||||
ANNE STEER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS G M E HABBIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL GOODWIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.05k | £100.20k | £2.76k | £3.90k | £22.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.47k | £17.92k | £10.35k | £52.81k | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE UPKEEP OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST PETER AND ST PAUL, RINGWOOD , AND ITS CHURCH HALL, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NEEDS OF THE CHURCH AND THE REQUIREMENTS OF THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL
Area of benefit
RINGWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pound Gate
Pound Lane
Burley
Burley Street
RINGWOOD
BH24 4EE
- Phone:
- 01425402028
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window