THE CHARLES DARWIN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the real understanding of the natural world and to ensure that the diversity of life on earth survives. The Charles Darwin Trust uses the intellectual and cultural heritage of Darwin, through his approach to science and his work at Down House and in the immediate countryside, to inspire a deeper understanding of the natural world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sarah Catherine Darwin | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr CLAIRE YVONNE BARLOW | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Professor James Costa | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Newall | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
KAREN GOLDIE-MORRISON | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Revd Professor Michael Jonathan Reiss | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.41k | £128.18k | £13 | £481 | £2.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.95k | £164.09k | £6.01k | £4.12k | £6.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ARTICLES AND ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JANUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN RELATION TO: (I) THE LIFE AND WORK OF CHARLES DARWIN, AND (II) THE DEVELOPMENT AND UNDERSTANDING OF NATURAL HISTORY AND THE LIFE SCIENCES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO DARWIN'S HOME AT DOWN HOUSE AND TO ANY ASSOCIATED INSTITUTIONS IN THE VILLAGE OF DOWNE IN KENT; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knox Cropper Chartered Accountants
65 Leadenhall Street 5th floor
London
EC3A 2AD
- Phone:
- 07767691972
- Email:
- info@charlesdarwintrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window