MARDEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 22 December 2000: Standard registration
- MARDEN MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Schlosser | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Janet Gowen-Smith | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Bridget Jane Harvey | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cooper | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Tippen | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|||||
IAN NEWTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Alison Hooker | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.74k | £49.32k | £61.67k | £61.25k | £52.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.64k | £62.35k | £49.95k | £73.12k | £44.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.83k | £22.86k | £4.22k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 18 JANUARY, 1999.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MARDEN IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
MARDEN, KENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marden Memorial Hall
Goudhurst Road
Marden
TONBRIDGE
TN12 9JX
- Phone:
- 01622832305
- Email:
- treasurermmh@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window