FRIENDS OF THE HOLY LAND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the Holy Land Institute for the Deaf.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Jordan
Governance
- 18 March 2000: Standard registration
- ALLAH KARIEM (UK) (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF THE HOLY LANDINSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN GEORGE ALLEN | Chair | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Robert Adeane Hanning | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY JAMES MARTIN | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
URSULA ELIZABETH MARTELL MB BS | Trustee |
|
||||||
HELEN PENFOLD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.02k | £36.48k | £30.01k | £47.20k | £31.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.54k | £38.69k | £25.60k | £48.37k | £30.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 12/01/2012
Charitable objects
TO HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOLY LAND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF, SALT, JORDAN IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lodge Farm
Aldwincle
KETTERING
Northamptonshire
NN14 3EN
- Phone:
- 07785314082
- Email:
- jonathan@holyland-deaf.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window