THE INDIGO TRUST

Charity number: 1075920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant making

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Benin
  • Cameroon
  • Ethiopia
  • Ghana
  • Kenya
  • Liberia
  • Malawi
  • Nigeria
  • Sierra Leone
  • South Africa
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sonia Priya Sodha Trustee 23 December 2020
None on record
SAMEER DINKER PADANIA Trustee 03 August 2020
None on record
WILLIAM JOHN PERRIN Trustee 16 January 2012
THE INSTITUTE FOR PHILANTHROPY
Received: On time
DOMINIC BRENDAN FLYNN Trustee 14 June 2007
THE ARDWICK TRUST
Received: On time
THE TRUE COLOURS TRUST
Received: On time
THE THREE GUINEAS TRUST
Received: On time
PINHAS RUTENBERG EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE WOOLBEDING CHARITY
Received: On time
FRANCESCA ELIZABETH SAINSBURY PERRIN Trustee 27 April 1999
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.40m £2.64m £284.40k £1.56m £6.68m
Total expenditure £4.18m £2.41m £1.72m £2.54m £3.72m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £4.19m £2.49m N/A £1.38m £6.25m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £4.19m £2.49m N/A £1.38m £6.25m
Income - Investment £210.16k £137.51k N/A £129.46k £136.15k
Income - Other £2.00k £15.03k N/A £55.44k £296.72k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.16m £2.38m N/A £2.52m £3.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £26.75k £27.46k N/A £28.86k £30.54k
Expenditure - Governance £6.32k £9.58k N/A £10.04k £11.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.81m £2.03m N/A £2.31m £3.43m
Expenditure - Investment management £26.75k £27.46k N/A £28.86k £30.54k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Own use assets £5.54k £17.81k N/A £8.14m £7.52k
Long-term investments £7.75m £9.37m N/A £10.03k £9.12m
Other assets £2.54m £3.28m N/A £2.76m £6.46m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities £378.36k £661.88k N/A £1.29m £2.15m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Sainsbury Family Charitable Tru
THE PEAK
5 Wilton Road
LONDON
SW1V 1AP
Phone:
02074100330