Trustees CITIZENS ADVICE NORTH OXFORDSHIRE AND SOUTH NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Charity number: 1079719
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Buchanan | Chair | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ashley Ritchie | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Donovan | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HUPFIELD | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Rosalind Humphreys | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Dinesh Kotecha | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
William Yule | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Peter Matten | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Stringer | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Baker | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Maloney | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Ingemar Hunnings | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.