ST CLARE MEDIA (EWTN) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes the Catholic Television channel EWTN in the United Kingdom by advertising, distributing a free monthly programme guide, advising how to obtain the channel and making programmes,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 May 2000: Standard registration
- DIVINE WORD PROGRAMMES LIMITED (Previous name)
- ST. CLARE MEDIA LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Warsasw | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JAMES STEWART LOCKHART BOGLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andy Pollock | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £322.98k | £297.20k | £263.67k | £262.07k | £328.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.99k | £291.56k | £279.85k | £285.74k | £289.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST MARCH 2000 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY THE PRODUCTION OF AND ASSISTANCE IN TRANSMISSION OF CATHOLIC RADIO AND TELEVISION PROGRAMMES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Penerley Road
Catford
London
SE6 2LH
- Phone:
- 02083502542
- Email:
- email@ewtn.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window