RELATE NORTH EAST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Counselling for couples,individuals, families and young people Education and training beneficial to any of the above (including lifeskills training)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Darlington
- Durham
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 14 April 2000: Standard registration
- 13 July 2021: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 13 July 2021: Funds transferred to 207314 R NATIONAL REALISATIONS (2024)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.99k | £306.27k | £169.46k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.12k | £288.95k | £173.33k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £71.31k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 02 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | 29 October 2018 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | 29 October 2018 | 29 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/12/2011 as amended on 28 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS. (2) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS AND MARRIAGE AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC (3) TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE AND WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE RELATIONSHIP CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS
Area of benefit
COUNTY & CITY OF DURHAM; CITY OF SUNDERLAND; BOROUGHS OF DARLINGTON, HARTLEPOOL, STOCKTON, MIDDLESBROUGH, REDCAR, CLEVELAND, SCARBOROUGH - SEE MEMORANDUM FOR FURTHER DETAILS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window