ALL SAINTS ACTION NETWORK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All Saints Action Network Ltd is a community managed social enterprise operating mainly within the All Saints area of Wolverhampton. Its objects are to improve the quality of life for all people living and working in this area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £200,498 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 07 January 2003: Standard registration
- ASAN (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harjit Singh | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wilson Wilfred Muchenje | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham Sharples | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Samuels OBE | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Gulliford | Trustee | 19 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mavis Collins | Trustee | 18 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Philip Davis | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUREEN JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375.31k | £418.12k | £360.40k | £472.30k | £417.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £420.53k | £458.46k | £431.22k | £514.64k | £497.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £161.12k | £162.64k | £190.74k | £187.92k | £200.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.49k | N/A | £11.48k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 1 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 NOVEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
"TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ALL SAINTS AREA OF WOLVERHAMPTON, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISABILITY AND OLD AGE, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE FACILITIES WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS O LIFE"TICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE TH ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
ALL SAINTS AREA OF WOLVERHAMPTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Action Network
The Community Centre
All Saints Road
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV2 1EL
- Phone:
- 01902556681
- Email:
- info@asan.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window